Board of Heating and Cooling Examiners
174 items found
Board & Commission Appointments, Russell L. Fawcett. 1/1/1986 - 12/31/1987
Certificate of Appoitment, Russell L. Fawcett - 1986
Board & Commission Appointments, James E. Righter, 1/1/1986 - 12/31/1987
Mayor Hudnut to Phil Harris, January 28, 1987
Certificate of Appointment, Russell L. Fawcett - 1988
Certificate for Russell L. Fawcett - 1988
Certificate of Appointment, Aaron York - 1988
Mayor Hudnut to Phil Harris, January 11, 1989
Board & Commission Appointments, Phil Harris, 1989-1991
Certificate for Thomas Moore - 1989
Board & Commission Appointments, Thomas Moore, 1989-1991
Mayor Hudnut to Russell L. Fawcett, January 11, 1989
Certificate of Appointment, Russell L. Fawcett - 1989
Certificate for Aaron York - 1989
Mayor Hudnut to Thomas Godby, January 11, 1989
Certificate for Thomas Godby - 1989
Board & Commission Appointments, Thomas Godby, 1989-1991
Mayor Hudnut to Harold J. Sander, January 11, 1989
Certificate of Appointment, Harold Sander - 1989
Certificate for Harold J. Sander - 1989