Board of Heating and Cooling Examiners
174 items found
Board & Commission Appointments, Tom Moore, 1/1/1987 - 12/31/1988
Board & Commission Appointments, Harold Sander, 1/1/1987 - 12/31/1988
Certificate for Thomas Godby - 1987
Certificate of Appointment, Thomas Godby - 1987
Mayor Hudnut to Howard S. Wilcox Sr., November 22, 1988
Board & Commission Appointments, Howard S. Wilcox Sr., 11/22/1988 - 12/31/1991
Mayor Hudnut to William Freije, Jr, December 17, 1977
Certificate of Appointment, William F. Freije, Jr - 1978
Scotty Bennett to Ted Kaptain, February 24, 1977
Certificate of Appoitment, Jesse L. Carter - 1978
Mayor Hudnut to Doyle Warwick, April 2, 1979
Mayor Hudnut to William F. Freije Jr., March 20, 1980
Mayor Hudnut to Walter H. Hilmes, March 23, 1981
Mayor Hudnut to William F. Freije Jr., January 27, 1982
Board & Commission Appointments, Phil Harris, 1/1/1985 - 12/31/1986
Certificate of Appoitment, Phil Harris - 1985
Mayor Hudnut to Tom Moore, Janury 29, 1985 (Corrected Address)
Mayor Hudnut to Tom Moore, January 29, 1985
Mayor Hudnut to Harold J. Sander, January 29, 1985
Mayor Hudnut to Aaron York, Janury 15, 1986