Board of Heating and Cooling Examiners
174 items found
Board & Commission Appointments, Aaron York, 1/1/1986 - 12/31/1987
Mayor Hudnut to Russell L. Fawcett, January 15, 1986
Mayor Hudnut to James E. Righter, January 15, 1986
Board & Commission Appointments, Russell L. Fawcett, 1/15/1988 - 12/31/1989
Mayor Hudnut to James E. Righter, January 15, 1988
Board & Commission Appointments, James E. Righter, 1/15/1988 - 12/31/1989
Certificate of Appointment, James E. Righter - 1988
Certificate for James E. Righter - 1988
Mayor Hudnut to Aaron York, January 15, 1988
Board & Commission Appointments, Aaron York, 1/1/1988 - 12/31/1988
Certificate for Aaron York
Certificate of Appointment, Phil Harris, January 11, 1989
Certificate for Phil Harris - 1989
Certificate for Philip R. Harris, January 20, 1989
Mayor Hudnut to Thomas Moore, January 11, 1989
Certificate of Appointment, Thomas Moore - 1989
Certificate for Russell L. Fawcett - 1989
Board & Commission Appointments, Russell L. Fawcett, 1989- 1991
Mayor Hudnut to Aaron York, January 11, 1989
Certificate of Appointment, Aaron York - 1989