Board of Heating and Cooling Examiners
174 items found
Mayor Hudnut to Tom Moore, Janury 29, 1985 (Corrected Address)
Mayor Hudnut to Walter H. Hilmes, November 25, 1985
Mayor Hudnut to Tom Moore, January 29, 1985
Board & Commission Appointments, Tom Moore, 1/1/1985 - 12/31/1986
Mayor Hudnut to Harold J. Sander, January 29, 1985
Board and Commission Appointments, Harold Sander, 1/1/1985 - 12/1/1986
Mayor Hudnut to Aaron York, Janury 15, 1986
Board & Commission Appointments, Aaron York, 1/1/1986 - 12/31/1987
Certificate of Appoitment, Aaron York - 1986
Mayor Hudnut to Russell L. Fawcett, January 15, 1986
Board & Commission Appointments, Russell L. Fawcett. 1/1/1986 - 12/31/1987
Certificate of Appoitment, Russell L. Fawcett - 1986
Mayor Hudnut to James E. Righter, January 15, 1986
Board & Commission Appointments, James E. Righter, 1/1/1986 - 12/31/1987
Mayor Hudnut to Phil Harris, January 28, 1987
Board & Commission Appointments, Russell L. Fawcett, 1/15/1988 - 12/31/1989
Certificate of Appointment, Russell L. Fawcett - 1988
Certificate for Russell L. Fawcett - 1988
Mayor Hudnut to James E. Righter, January 15, 1988
Board & Commission Appointments, James E. Righter, 1/15/1988 - 12/31/1989